Boeing corporation board of directors
Web12 rows · Boeing Corporate Offices. 929 Long Bridge Drive. Arlington, VA 22202. The Corporate Secretary ... Boeing director since: 2010. Professional highlights: ... As co-founder and director … Today, the company manufactures the 737, 747, 767, 777 and 787 families of … Boeing director since: 2024. Professional highlights: Senior Advisor, AE Industrial … Boeing director since: 2024. Professional highlights: U.S. Chairman and CEO, … Boeing director since: 2016. Professional highlights: ... Mr. Bradway brings to the … Boeing director since: 2024. Professional highlights: Operating Advisor, Clayton, … Boeing director since: 2024. Professional highlights: Special Advisor, Consello … Boeing director since: 2024. Professional highlights: Inspector General, U.S. Air … WebDavid Loffing. Vice President and Chief Engineer. Boeing Commercial Airplanes. Brad McMullen. Senior Vice President, Commercial Sales & Marketing. Ihssane Mounir. …
Boeing corporation board of directors
Did you know?
WebJan 6, 2024 · ATLANTA--(BUSINESS WIRE)--The Coca-Cola Company today named J. Michael Luttig, former U.S. federal judge and general counsel for The Boeing Co., to serve as counselor and special advisor to the company and its board of directors. Judge Luttig will advise the company and its board of directors on tax matters, with particular focus … WebJun 21, 2024 · Boeing. Jun 21, 2024, 16:30 ET. ARLINGTON, Va., June 21, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Boeing Company [NYSE: BA] Board of Directors today announced that it has elected David L. Gitlin as its newest ...
WebOct 21, 2024 · The Boeing Company Derivative Litigation (Sept. 7, 2024) is another in a series of cases in recent years in which the Delaware Court of Chancery has found, in the wake of a “corporate trauma” relating to product safety issues, that the company’s independent directors may have personal liability to the stockholders, under the “ … WebJun 21, 2024 · Boeing. Jun 21, 2024, 16:30 ET. ARLINGTON, Va., June 21, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Boeing Company [NYSE: BA] Board of Directors today …
WebJan 18, 2024 · Smith retired from The Boeing Company in July 2024 after a more than 30-year career. He most recently served as Executive Vice President and Chief Financial Officer, with responsibility for the company’s Enterprise Operations, Finance, Strategy and Shared Services organizations. ... Smith currently serves on the board of directors of … WebOct 11, 2024 · Dennis Muilenburg Continues as CEO, President and Director; Lead Director David Calhoun Elected Non-Executive Chairman Board to Add New Director with Deep Safety Experience The Boeing Company (NYSE: BA) today announced that its Board of Directors has separated the roles of chairman and chief executive officer. …
WebJohri also brings to the Board unique insights relating to his senior leadership experience at United Technologies, a major supplier to aerospace companies like Boeing. In addition, as an independent director and audit committee member at Cardinal Health, Mr. Johri brings to the Board experience in risk oversight and corporate governance of a ...
WebFeb 17, 2024 · CHICAGO, Feb. 17, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Boeing Company (NYSE: BA) board of directors today announced that directors Arthur D. Collins Jr. and Susan C. Schwab will retire from the board when their terms expire and will not stand for reelection at the company's Annual Meeting of Shareholders. The board also named chairs to its six … christine champlinWebApr 20, 2024 · CHICAGO, April 20, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Boeing Company [NYSE: BA] today announced that its Board of Directors has extended the company's age-65 … christine chamsonWebLynne has served on the board of Boeing Company since January 2024. She also serves on the board of directors of several nonprofit organizations, and on the board of … christine chanceyWebJan 3, 2024 · Boeing director Schwab also serves on the boards of Caterpillar, FedEx and Marriott International and holds down posts as an advisor to the law firm Mayer Brown and a professor at the University ... christine champ pwcWebMay 28, 2024 · About. Dr. John J.Tracy served as the Boeing Chief Technology Officer and Senior Vice President of Engineering, Operations, & Technology from 2006 through 2016. He served on the Boeing Executive ... gerflor confort thermiqueWebJan 15, 2024 · CHICAGO, Jan. 15, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Boeing Company (NYSE: BA) board of directors today announced that Lynne Doughtie has been elected to the board, replacing Caroline Kennedy who has resigned following three years of dedicated service.. Doughtie, 58, retired from KPMG in 2024, after serving as U.S. Chairman and … gerflor clic systemWebMay 28, 2024 · About. Dr. John J.Tracy served as the Boeing Chief Technology Officer and Senior Vice President of Engineering, Operations, & Technology from 2006 through … christine chancerel